De Almeida, John Rukshan (CPSO#: 82911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3-955
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2182
Fax: (416) 946-2300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John R. De Almeida Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. De Almeida ( CPSO# 82911 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Room 3-955
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2182

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RUKSHAN DE ALMEIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ALMEIDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2013