De Alwis, Watutantrige Assajee (CPSO#: 26396)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact: Dr. Michael Murray 72 Brant Avenue Brantford, ON N3T 5Z8 Tel: (519) 756-4310
Date Received: 30 Mar 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2009