De Banne, Marie Danielle (CPSO#: 59023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1987


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Russell Medical Centre
110 Craig
Box 70
Russell ON  K4R 1C7
Phone: (613) 445-3220
Fax: (613) 445-3659
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle DeBanne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2004

Dr. M. De Banne ( CPSO# 59023 )

Business Address:
110 Craig Street
P.O. Box 70
Russell ON  K4R 1C7
Phone Number: (613) 445-5368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARIE DANIELLE DE BANNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BANNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 1988 to 22 Dec 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1987