Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

De Bolster, Cornelius Leonard (CPSO#: 56644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
640 Ford Drive
Oakville ON  L6J 7V7
Phone: (905) 338-8222
Fax: (905) 338-7863
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. De Bolster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Bolster ( CPSO# 56644 )

Business Address:
640 Ford Drive
Oakville ON  L6J 7V7
Phone Number: (905) 338-8222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORNELIUS LEONARD DE BOLSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BOLSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1986