De Bosset, Philippe (CPSO#: 26799)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Lausanne, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com For files created after June 2006, patients can contact the College for more information regarding where to find there medical records.
Date Received: 19 Feb 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 2013