De Carli, Claudio Fabian (CPSO#: 85575)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Cordoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 06 Oct 2006 to 06 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2007 to 06 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2008 to 30 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009