Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

De Champlain, Remi (CPSO#: 69908)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007