De Croos, Joseph Annson Bennet (CPSO#: 85635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pringle Creek Plaza
728 Anderson Street
Whitby ON  L1N 3V6
Phone: (905) 665-5800
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

pringle creek plaza
728 anderson street
whitby on
canada
Whitby ON  L1N 3V6
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-5800
Fax: (905) 665-5807
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annson De Croos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. De Croos ( CPSO# 85635 )

Business Address:
Pringle Creek Plaza
728 Anderson Street
Whitby ON  L1N 3V6
Phone Number: (905) 665-5800

Medical Records Location

Address: 728 Anderson St Whitby, ON L1N 3V6
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Oct 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Joseph  Annson  Bennet  De Croos may practise independently in the area of
            Family Medicine only.