Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

De Foa, James Lance (CPSO#: 65398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Churchill Avenue
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone: (705) 975-0768
Fax: (514) 371-8172
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

White River Medical Clinic
102 Winnipeg Street
PO Box 278
White River ON  P0M 3G0
Canada
Phone: 8078222320
Fax: 8078222686
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES LANCE DE FOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FOA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993