De Freitas, Karen Denise (CPSO#: 71381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forensic Program
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6747
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN DENISE DE FREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FREITAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002