De Gouveia, Paulo Clasio (CPSO#: 103021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakefront Clinic
550 Queens Quay W
Toronto ON  M5V 3M8
Phone: (647) 347-0576
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULO CLASIO DE GOUVEIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GOUVEIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016