De Groot, Gerrit Willem (CPSO#: 31929)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008