De Groote, Jacques Hugues Pierre (CPSO#: 64613)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Vrije Universiteit Brussel, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1991 to 31 May 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 18 Sep 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1997