De Guzman, Cecilia Ramos (CPSO#: 31447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. De Guzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Hospital Medical Records 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016