De Jesus, Filemon Reyes (CPSO#: 52054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of the Philippines, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
144 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 6W2
Phone: (613) 722-5680
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cosico De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. De Jesus ( CPSO# 52054 )
Dr. C. Cosico-De-Jesus ( CPSO# 50294 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
Arnprior & District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
144 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 6W2
Phone Number: (613) 722-5680

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILEMON REYES DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987