De Jesus, Generoso Luluquisin (CPSO#: 23858)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Far Eastern University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008