De Jong, Christine Grace (CPSO#: 65171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
482 Burlington Avenue
Burlington ON  L7S 1R5
Phone: (905) 632-8954
Fax: (905) 632-9143
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine De Jong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Jong ( CPSO# 65171 )

Business Address:
482 Burlington Avenue
Burlington ON  L7S 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 632-9796

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE GRACE DE JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993