De La Chevrotiere, Joseph Gerard Jean (CPSO#: 50416)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005