De La Rocha, Claudio Alberto Gonzalez (CPSO#: 25007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rudd Services Limited
Suite 825
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-597-0997 Ext. 225
Fax: 416-597-2912
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

710 Dorval Dr. Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: 905-607-0022 Ext. 437
Fax: 905-607-0013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3095 Glen Erin Dr.
Ste 7-10
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Canada
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIO ALBERTO GONZALEZ DE LA ROCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LA ROCHA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1986

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 1995
Summary:

In April 1995, Dr. de la Rocha pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s.61(3)(a) of the Health 
Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.    The 
Discipline Committe accepted Dr. de la Rocha s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct.   
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. de la Rocha's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of ninety days. 
 
   2. This period of suspension was itself to be suspended, provided that Dr. de la Rocha, within fifteen days after the date 
      upon which this Order became final, filed a written undertaking with the Registrar to prepare a proposal for a protocol 
      for use in community hospitals, concerning the withdrawal of life support from terminally ill patients, and provided 
      further that: 
 
      (a) he submitted to the Registrar, within thirty days of filing the written undertaking, an organizational plan for 
          the development of the proposal for the protocol; 
 
      (b) the proposal for the protocol addressed the pharmacological management of symptoms, as well as the 
          subjects of informal consent, ethics, patient autonomy, and the involvement of the family and the family 
          physician in the decision-making process; 
 
      (c) in the course of preparation of the protocol, Dr. de la Rocha reviewed relevant literature and consulted widely 
          with experts in palliative care, ethics and critical care, and with patients' rights organizations; 
 
      (d) the proposal for a protocol was of such a quality as to render it suitable for submission to a peer-reviewed 
          journal, and was submitted by Dr. de la Rocha for consideration for publication by such a journal; 
 
      (e) Dr. de la Rocha, within 270 days of filing the written undertaking, submitted to the Registrar a copy of the 
          proposal for a protocol, and also written confirmation that he complied with sections 2(b), 2(c) and 2(d) cited 
          above. 
 
   3. In the event that, having filed the written undertaking referred to in section 2 above, Dr. de la Rocha failed to comply 
      with the deadlines contained in sections 2(a) or 2(e) cited above, his licence to practice would thereupon be 
      suspended for a period of ninety days, such suspension to commence immediately following such failure to comply. 
 
   4. These penalties were to be recorded in the Register. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 03, 1995