De La Torre, Josephine Debbie (CPSO#: 84810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:De La Salle University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
77 Westmount Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 829-3838
Fax: (519) 829-2155
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Sevices
J T Powell Building
Unviversity of Guelph
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 836-7431
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-4120
Fax: (519) 836-7431
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Josephine D. De La Torre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. De La Torre ( CPSO# 84810 )

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Business Address:
110 - 77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 829-3838

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE DEBBIE DE LA TORRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LA TORRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2008