De Lama Caro-Paton, Gema (CPSO#: 104420)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Madrid, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016