De Lasa, Cristina (CPSO#: 92961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33124
Fax: (416) 583-1284
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cristina De Lasa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Lasa ( CPSO# 92961 )

Business Address:
CAMH
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA DE LASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LASA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012