De Lorenzi, Claudio (CPSO#: 52985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DeLorenzi Clinic
150 Edna Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 6S1
Phone: (519) 570-2811
Fax: (519) 744-1461
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Silhouette Cosmetic Laser Clinic
150 Edna Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 6S1
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-1533
Fax: (519) 744-1461
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DeLorenzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Lorenzi ( CPSO# 52985 )

Business Address:
150 Edna Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 6S1
Phone Number: (519) 590-1280

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIO DE LORENZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LORENZI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1989 to 01 Apr 1989
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984