De Luca, Vincenzo (CPSO#: 82141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Naples, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH College Street Site
Schizophrenia Program
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34421
Fax: (416) 979-4666
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 May 2005 to 07 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vincenzo De Luca may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. De Luca holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. De Luca no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.