De Maio, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 60655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Qikiqtani General Hospital
P O Box 1000
Station 1036
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone: (867) 975-8600
Fax: (867) 975-8616

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE DE MAIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MAIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2005