De Marchi, William Gregory (CPSO#: 50423)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duemler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Duemler ( CPSO# 33259 )
Dr. W. De Marchi ( CPSO# 50423 )

Business Address:
303 - 2021 Cliff Road
Mississauga ON  L5A 3N7
Phone Number: (905) 848-3711

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 31 Dec 1979
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015