De Monte, Franco (CPSO#: 55558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Neurosurgery
Box 442
MD Anderson Cancer Center
1515 Holcombe Boulevard
Houston TX  77030
United States
Phone: (713) 792-2400
Fax: (713) 794-4950

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCO DE MONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MONTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1986