De Ponte, Delta Maria (CPSO#: 56748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RPO Box 18557 250 Wincott Drive Etobicoke ON M9R 4C8
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016