De Prest, Brian Arthur (CPSO#: 64983)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2005