De Rubeis, Debra Ann (CPSO#: 66726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 2C
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 885-210-0758
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905 897 9228
Fax: 905 8977780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2079 Lakeshore Road East
Burlington ON  L7M 1E2
Canada
Phone: 905 6603303
Fax: 885-210-0758
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

2079 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7M 1E2
Canada
Phone: 905 6603303
Fax: 885-210-0758
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA ANN DE RUBEIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUBEIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006