De Sanctis, Olga Josephine (CPSO#: 61181)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992