De Sequeira, Carlos Miguel Gouveia (CPSO#: 73159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7568
Fax: (905) 472-7605
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

110 copper creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos De Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Sequeira ( CPSO# 73159 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7568

Business Address:
202 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLOS MIGUEL GOUVEIA DE SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1998