De Silva, Anne (CPSO#: 56653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Konkani, Portuguese

Education:University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1223 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone: (416) 519-7547
Fax: (416) 519-7674
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4158 sheppard Ave. East
Toronto ON  M1S 1T3
Canada
Phone: (647) 267-2176
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE DE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SILVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Rotating - Incomplete Information

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)