De Souza, Henry Rodrigues (CPSO#: 20851)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry De Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 53 Chancery Circle St Catharines, ON L2M 7R3
Date Received: 29 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 2015