De Souza, Sacha Marion (CPSO#: 104754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1E5
Phone: (519) 358-1880
Fax: (519) 358-1586
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 519-326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. De Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Souza ( CPSO# 104754)

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Child & Adolescent Clinic
Lower level
202 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 359-1880

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sacha Marion De Souza may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.