De Souza, Selwyn Xavier Pius (CPSO#: 62210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1907 Baseline Road
Suite 101
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C7
Phone: (613) 723-1406
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SELWYN XAVIER PIUS DE SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991