De Souza, Stephen Anthony Mario (CPSO#: 63732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Associated Retina Consultant
1750 E Glendale Avenue
Phoenix AZ  85020
United States
Phone: (602) 242-4928

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANTHONY MARIO DE SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992