De Veber, George Angus (CPSO#: 16646)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015