DeAngelis, Dan Douglas (CPSO#: 68005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Sismet Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 8375
Fax: (416) 813-7040
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

600 University Avenue, #411
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dan D. DeAngelis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. DeAngelis ( CPSO# 68005 )

Business Address:
1880 Sismet Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
411 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
705 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 481-4433

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAN DOUGLAS DEANGELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANGELIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999