DeCarolis, Mary Louise (CPSO#: 59367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Names: Waddell, Mary Louise (used until: 19 Oct 2010 )     Decarolis, Mary Louise (used until: 09 Jul 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3512
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DeCarolis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeCarolis ( CPSO# 59367 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LOUISE DECAROLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DECAROLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1989