DeMarchi, Ryan (CPSO#: 82998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 522-0292
Fax: (705) 522-9933
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan DeMarchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. DeMarchi ( CPSO# 82998 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-0292

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN DEMARCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMARCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011