DeMille, Janet Katherine (CPSO#: 71213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
999 Balmoral Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6E7
Phone: (807) 625-5965
Fax: (807) 625-5973
Electoral District: 09

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET KATHERINE DEMILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Aug 2010 to 16 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1999