DePaoli, John Angelo (CPSO#: 68314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: De Paoli, John Angelo (used until: 31 May 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1436 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3A9
Phone: (416) 240-1382
Fax: (416) 240-1103
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John DePaoli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. DePaoli ( CPSO# 68314 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1436 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 240-1382

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ANGELO DEPAOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEPAOLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996