DeRose, Gaetano (CPSO#: 27512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus E2 123
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6644
Fax: (519) 667-6573
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gaetano DeRose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. DeRose ( CPSO# 27512 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus E2 123
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAETANO DEROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEROSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1975