DeYoung, John Paul (CPSO#: 30137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 938-2332
Fax: (613) 938-3172
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Paul DeYoung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeYoung ( CPSO# 30137 )

Business Address:
McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone Number: (613) 938-2332

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL DEYOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEYOUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984