Deagle, George Leslie (CPSO#: 42958)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994