Deakon, Robert Timothy (CPSO#: 52946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Wyecroft Road
Unit 18
Oakville ON  L6K 3T7
Phone: (905) 849-7220
Fax: (905) 849-7238
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deakon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Deakon ( CPSO# 52946 )

Business Address:
18 - 250 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 849-7220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT TIMOTHY DEAKON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEAKON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986