Deally, Carole Margaret Rae (CPSO#: 73084)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 1998 to 21 Oct 1998
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008