Dean, Heather Jean (CPSO#: 42843)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010