Dean, Malcolm Hewlin Clark (CPSO#: 13149)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1950
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999